U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00623
  • Case Name: Hausler v. Vivint Solar Developer, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Extend (other)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Submit Closing Document]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • November 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 27, 2022: [Stay]
  • September 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 16, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • September 15, 2022: [Stay]
  • September 15, 2022: [Remand]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 24, 2022: [Objections]
  • August 23, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.