U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01395-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Syed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 09, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 17, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Strike]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • September 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Discovery Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • August 29, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.