U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01388-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavero Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • December 01, 2022: [Release from Custody]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.