U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00634
  • Case Name: Medina v. Kania, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Submit Closing Document]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 09, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 10, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • October 10, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.