U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00633
  • Case Name: Ferlic et al v. Mesilla Valley Regional Dispatch Authority et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Minute Order]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 07, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Supplement]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 19, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Disqualify Counsel]
  • September 12, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 09, 2022: [Stay]
  • September 01, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.