U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00639
  • Case Name: Corredor-Guerrero et al v. Sentry Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 31, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 06, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2022: [Remand]
  • September 21, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • September 09, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • September 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Counterclaim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.