U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00641
  • Case Name: Rodgers v. Torrez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.