U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00631
  • Case Name: Denewiler v. Santa Fe County Adult Detention Facility
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Produce]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.