U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00642
  • Case Name: Hallstrom v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 17, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Setting Briefing Schedule]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 12, 2022: [Seal]
  • December 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.