U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00640
  • Case Name: Williams v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 12, 2023: [Remand to Agency]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting Briefing Schedule]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 16, 2022: [Seal]
  • November 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • September 02, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.