U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00643
  • Case Name: Coles v. Dean et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Remand]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.