U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00649
  • Case Name: Ferguson v. Nexstar Media Group et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 09, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.