U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00877-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 12, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.