U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-01359-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Juan-Juan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 08, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 02, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 02, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.