U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00647
  • Case Name: Jeyaraman v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 27, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.