U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00650
  • Case Name: Cardenas et al v. General Motors, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.