U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00657
  • Case Name: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policies 50014400119 and 50014400120 v. Loya Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 20, 2023: [Crossclaim]
  • January 20, 2023: [Counterclaim]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Errata]
  • January 18, 2023: [Extend (other)]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 09, 2023: [Counterclaim]
  • January 09, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 06, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • January 03, 2023: [Service by Publication]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 16, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 16, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Default]
  • November 16, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Set Aside Default]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 02, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • November 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 24, 2022: [Declaration]
  • October 24, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 17, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • October 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 12, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • October 12, 2022: [Counterclaim]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.