U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00626
  • Case Name: Monnereau v. Trader Joe's Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • October 18, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 07, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.