U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00664
  • Case Name: Standard Insurance Company v. lakey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Declaration]
  • January 10, 2023: [Service by Publication]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 15, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.