U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00662
  • Case Name: McCombs v. Delta Group Electronics, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • September 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.