U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00668
  • Case Name: Garcia v. City of Carlsbad Board Members et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • December 15, 2022: [Vacate]
  • December 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 21, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.