U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00670
  • Case Name: Espinoza v. Excel Staffing Companies, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Status Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 15, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.