U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00676
  • Case Name: Smith v. Tascosa Office Machines, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • December 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Settlement]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.