U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00674
  • Case Name: Kimble v. EOG Resources, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.