U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01516-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mirabal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2023: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.