U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01523-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alba-Terraza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Transcript Order Form]
  • January 10, 2023: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
  • December 21, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • December 19, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • December 13, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 13, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.