U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00625
  • Case Name: Rice v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • September 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.