U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00679
  • Case Name: Gilley v. Gutierrez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 06, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • October 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.