U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00680
  • Case Name: Nuclear Watch New Mexico v. National Nuclear Security Administration of the U.S. Department of Energy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 23, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 07, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 15, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • September 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.