U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00659
  • Case Name: York Investments, LLC et al v. Border Parts Group, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 17, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.