U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00685
  • Case Name: Jeffries v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 01, 2022: [Affidavit]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • October 28, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • October 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.