U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00688
  • Case Name: Aguilar et al v. Health Care Service Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 04, 2023: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
September, 2022
  • September 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.