U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01399-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Majedi
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.