U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00690
  • Case Name: Ortiz v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.