U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00689
  • Case Name: Harrington III v. Luxury Home Broker ABQ, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 08, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 24, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 21, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 19, 2022: [Report re: patent/trademark/copyright]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.