U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00673
  • Case Name: Cain v. Bernalillo County Sheriff's Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • October 03, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 19, 2022: [Objections]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.