U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00675
  • Case Name: Herc Rentals, Inc. v. Ultimate Concrete, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 17, 2022: [Vacate]
  • October 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • September 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.