U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00687
  • Case Name: Mostoller v. USAA Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • October 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 25, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 20, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.