U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00672
  • Case Name: Frias v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2023: [Status Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • September 27, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • September 22, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.