U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00694
  • Case Name: Vigliano et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • September 26, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • September 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.