U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00697
  • Case Name: Baldonado v. Vivint Solar Developer, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 12, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 08, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.