U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00684
  • Case Name: Komar v. Gerber Life Agency, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 08, 2022: [Stay]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 21, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.