U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00656
  • Case Name: Hooper v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2023: [Status Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • September 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.