U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01508-2
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 23, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 22, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.