U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01563-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whiskers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.