U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01562-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Chavez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.