U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01561-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.