U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01560-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fleming
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.