U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01553-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz-Sorroza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Transcript Order Form]
  • January 19, 2023: [Transcript Order Form]
  • January 19, 2023: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • January 13, 2023: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 11, 2023: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.