U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00699
  • Case Name: Franklin v. Martinez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Order Setting Briefing Schedule]
  • May 14, 2025: [Reconsideration]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Compel]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 20, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Petition for 2254 Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.